+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- AM: WIELECHOWSKI
- NR: COSTELLO, DUNLEAVY, KELLY
- DP: COGHILL
- JUD RPT SCS(CRA) 1DP 3NR 1AM
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: MACKINNON, STEDMAN, GARDNER
- DP: BISHOP
- CRA RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- CRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N22
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 8
- PASSED Y38 N2
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 8
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/6 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2017
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN
- NR: EASTMAN, REINBOLD
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, PARISH
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: RAUSCHER
- DP: TALERICO, WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, PARISH, FANSLER
- CRA RPT 5DP 1NR
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- CRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor