+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRAX, SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MINA
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: ARMSTRONG, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD, WRIGHT, SHAW
- STA RPT 6DP
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- L&C REFERRAL REMOVED
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- STA, L&C, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23