+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/29 CHAPTER 6 SLA 01
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- 9:00 AM 3/13/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E2 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HB 79(TRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 79(TRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TRA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- LEMAN, TAYLOR, WILKEN, WARD, COWDERY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS, HALFORD,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/01
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP:COWDERY, WILKEN, WARD, ELTON, TAYLOR
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 79
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER, MURKOWSKI
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 79
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- KOHRING; NR: OGAN
- DP: KOOKESH, SCALZI, WILSON, MASEK,
- TRA RPT 5DP 1NR
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor