+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 15 SLA 17
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/22/17
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- 10:14 AM 6/12/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, BEGICH, HOFFMAN, MACKINNON,
- STEVENS, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, MEYER, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 78
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: MEYER, EGAN
- NR: WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 4DP
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, GARDNER, MACKINNON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, STA
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78
- PASSED Y31 N7 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 78
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- CRA RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, PARISH
- NR: TALERICO, RAUSCHER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N25 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/3 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON, GRENN, KAWASAKI, CLAMAN, SEATON, GARA
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor