+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (58)
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE REPORT RECEIVED
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- COMMITTEE REPORT RECEIVED
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- WALLACE, WALKER, VAKALIS
- PUBLIC MEMBERS: LESTENKOF, HOYT, OWEN,
- PEARCE, PETE KELLY, WILKEN, ALT: LEMAN
- (S) MEMBERS: TIM KELLY-COCHAIR, ADAMS,
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- HARRIS, THERRIAULT, JOULE, ALT: HUDSON
- (H) MEMBERS: MULDER-COCHAIR, MURKOWSKI,
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/12 CHAPTER 6 SLA 99
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- 3:55 PM 3/26/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N2 E2
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- LEMAN, MACKIE, PEARCE, PETE KELLY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, MILLER, DONLEY
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 77(FIN) AM S
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y13 N7
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 3/23/99
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS, ADAMS,
- FIN RPT 6DP 1AM
- WILKEN, LEMAN; DP W/AM: GREEN
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/LAA)
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TIM KELLY
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/99
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 77(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DAVIES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES, CROFT, KEMPLEN
- PASSED Y33 E7
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, KOHRING,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 1NR
- AUSTERMAN, DAVIS, WILLIAMS, FOSTER;
- NR: GRUSSENDORF
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/LAA)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- JAMES, MURKOWSKI; NR: CROFT
- DP: FOSTER, PHILLIPS, COGHILL, KOTT,
- MLV RPT 6DP 1NR
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER, PHILLIPS
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- MLV, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor