+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/23 CHAPTER 8 SLA 99
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/99
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- 2:10 PM 4/7/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E1 A1
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4DP AND 1 OR 3/25/99
- DP: TIM KELLY, MILLER, LEMAN, PEARCE;
- OTHER RECOMMENDATION: ELLIS
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA)
- AM NO 1 OFFERED & WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y15 N5
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 76(RLS) AM S
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 76(RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): KEMPLEN, MULDER, CROFT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) 3DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, PORTER, COWDERY;
- NR: BERKOWITZ, JOULE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA) 2/26/99
- RETURNED TO RULES
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA)
- NR: JOULE, KOOKESH
- DP: HALCRO, HARRIS, MURKOWSKI, DYSON;
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 4DP 2NR
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)