+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On September 15, 2005 in the House:
- 2:03 PM 7/15/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/25 CHAPTER 84 SLA 05
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 76(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 76(FIN)
On April 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, OLSON, DYSON
- NR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN5: (CED)
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: WAGONER, ELTON, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- NR: GUESS, DYSON, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN5: (CED)
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 76(FIN) AM
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 76(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y32 N2 E6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 5NR
- DP: HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, JOULE;
- NR: STOLTZE, HAWKER, MOSES, KELLY, MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN5: (CED)
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: GATTO, KAPSNER, OLSON, ELKINS, SEATON, LEDOUX, RAMRAS, SAMUELS
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: (CED)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN