+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- W/PARTIAL VETO: EFD OF LAW 7/1/97
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 99 SLA 97
- 11:15 AM 6/10/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 1997 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADPT Y40 CCS HB 76
On May 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADPT Y19 N- E1 CCS HB 76
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE CMTE REPORT READ
On May 9, 1997 in the House:
- CONFERENCE CMTE REPORT READ
On April 22, 1997 in the House:
- H LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- S LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *PEARCE,SHARP,ADAMS
On April 18, 1997 in the House:
- *HANLEY,THERRIAULT,GRUSSENDORF
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N35 E4 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y18 N- E2
- PASSED Y13 N5 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 76(FIN) AMS
On April 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CAL & 1NR 4/16/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N13 E2
On April 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- TORGERSON, DONLEY NR: ADAMS
- DP:PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 4, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 76(FIN)
On April 3, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/97
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- NR: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- MARTIN, KOHRING, DAVIS, KELLY
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MULDER, FOSTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 2NR
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- OMB LETTER ATTACHED
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor