+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/03
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/12 CHAPTER 84 SLA 03
- LETTER TO AMHTA
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- LETTER TO AMHTA FORTHCOMING
- 10:47AM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y20 N- CCS SSHB 76
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC RPT ADOPTED Y33 N4 E2 A1 CCS SSHB 76
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CC REPORT: CCS SSHB 76
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- KERTTULA REPLACED CROFT
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- HARRIS (CHAIR), WILLIAMS, CROFT
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N37 E2 A1
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 76(FIN) AM S
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 76(FIN)AM S
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/29 CALENDAR
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- NR: TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, STEVENS B, BUNDE;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSSHB 76(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 76(FIN)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- MOVED TO THE BOTTOM OF THE CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP - 4/9/03 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2003
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- CROFT, MOSES
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: JOULE,
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, CHENAULT,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 3NR
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003(B)
- FIN
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003(B)
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor