+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On September 15, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/3/05
- 2:03 PM 7/15/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/5 CHAPTER 87 SLA 05
On May 8, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N5 E1 A2
- ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT UC
- CONCUR MOTION WITHDRAWN
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- CONCUR MOTION WITHDRAWN
On May 6, 2005 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 75(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 75(FIN)
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SEEKINS, WAGONER, DYSON, HUGGINS, WILKEN, GREEN, THERRIAULT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2005
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON, STEDMAN
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11
- DP: WAGONER, DYSON, SEEKINS, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: ELTON
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 75(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y34 E6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 75(FIN)
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2005
On April 1, 2005 in the House:
- DP: HOLM, KELLY, FOSTER, STOLTZE, MEYER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 3NR
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, HOLM, FOSTER, MEYER, CROFT
- NR: HAWKER, JOULE, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: SEATON, LEDOUX
- DP: OLSON, ELKINS, CRAWFORD, SAMUELS, RAMRAS;
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor