+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/14
- 12:52 PM 7/23/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 106 SLA 14
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 75(FIN)
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 75(FIN)
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN3: (UA)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 23
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 4DP
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN3: (UA)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 75(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 75(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP
- FN3: (UA)
- AUSTERMAN
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, THOMPSON
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, KELLER, LYNN
- STA RPT 5DP
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor