+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/28/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/27 CHAPTER 2 SLA 03
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- 3:22 PM 3/11/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 74(FIN)(EFD ADD)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THIRD TIME CSHB 74(FIN)(EFD ADD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2003
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN2: (CED)
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 74(FIN)
- PASSED Y31 E8 V1
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 E8 A1 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 74(FIN)(EFD ADD)
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE,
- CROFT, MOSES, WHITAKER, FOSTER,
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN2: (CED)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
- FN1: (CED)
- DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON; AM: ROKEBERG
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- L&C RPT 6DP 1AM
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS