+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, N.FOSTER, SALMON, AUSTERMAN, THOMAS
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 4NR
- NR: KELLER, CISSNA, HERRON, MUNOZ
- FN1: (DEC)
- FN2: (DNR)
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor