+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/25/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 54 SLA 95
On May 13, 1995 in the House:
- 11:30 AM 5/13/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 74(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, HALFORD,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/95
- GREEN, MILLER, KELLY, TORGERSON, RIEGER,
- FRANK, SHARP, DUNCAN, ZHAROFF
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On May 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FNS (CORR, DPS, LAW)
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
On March 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FNS (CORR, DPS, LAW)
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/03/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y34 N2 E4
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 74(FIN)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (CORR) 2/1/95
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (LAW, DPS) 2/10/95
- AM: FOSTER, BROWN
- NR: KELLY
- DP: MARTIN
- DP: PARNELL, KOHRING, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: HANLEY, THERRIAULT, NAVARRE, MULDER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 1NR 2AM
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- DP: PORTER
- JUD RPT 5DP 2AM
- DP: GREEN, BUNDE, TOOHEY, B.DAVIS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (CORR) 2/1/95
- AM: VEZEY, FINKELSTEIN
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING, OGAN
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (CORR)
- DP: ROBINSON, WILLIS, OGAN
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, GREEN, IVAN
- STA RPT 7DP
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS, ROKEBERG
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, TOOHEY
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 6, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor