+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/3/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 16 SLA 03
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- 10:20AM 4/17/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E3 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 71(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 71(FIN)
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2003
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- STEVENS B, TAYLOR
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN, BUNDE,
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP NEW TITLE
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 71
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 E1 A1 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 71
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2003
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 8DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, JOULE, CROFT,
- MOSES, WHITAKER, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- NR: STOLTZE
- FN1: (CED)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- ANDERSON
- CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG,
- DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, GATTO,
- L&C RPT 7DP
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor