+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2010
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 7(TRA)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 7(TRA)
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: (DOT)
- FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER
- DP: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, KELLY, SALMON,
- FIN RPT CS(TRA) NT 11DP
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: PETERSEN, GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, MUNOZ, P.WILSON
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 5DP
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor