+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (72)
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 45 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/03
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- 3:30 PM 5/18/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- RESCIND FAILING CONCUR Y27 N10 E3
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y26 N11 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N9 E3
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO (H) AS REQUESTED
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- REQUESTED RETURN FROM SENATE
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR TAKEN UP
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y18 N19 E2 A1
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR MOTION WITHDRAWN
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 69(RES)
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 69(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, ELTON,
- HOFFMAN
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COWDERY, GREEN,
- WILKEN, TAYLOR, DYSON, WAGONER, SEEKINS
- STEVENS B, THERRIAULT, BUNDE, OLSON
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WAGONER, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, DYSON;
- NR: ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 69
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N28 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y38 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KOHRING NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 69
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP 1NR
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, HEINZE, MASEK,
- WOLF, GUTTENBERG, FATE,CHENAULT;
- NR: KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/12 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, WILSON, HAWKER,
- FOSTER
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- O&G RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: CHENAULT, MCGUIRE, ROKEBERG,
- CRAWFORD, FATE, KOHRING; NR: KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor