+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 17, 2010 in the House:
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 69(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y32 N5 E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 69(FIN)
On April 16, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, CRAWFORD, SEATON, GUTTENBERG, P.WILSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, SALMON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR
- COSPONSOR(S): SALMON
- NR: JOULE, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER
- FN2: (EED)
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, THOMAS, BUCH, GARDNER
- FN1: (EED)
- NR: P.WILSON
- DNP: KELLER
- DP: MUNOZ, GARDNER, BUCH, SEATON
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor