+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/4/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 52 SLA 99
On May 22, 1999 in the House:
- 3:40 PM 5/21/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 68
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/99
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- PETE KELLY, ADAMS, WILKEN, LEMAN
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, GREEN,
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- DP: MACKIE, TIM KELLY, LEMAN, HOFFMAN
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- L&C, FIN
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y32 E8
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 68
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/99
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, KOHRING,
- AUSTERMAN, GRUSSENDORF, DAVIES, DAVIS,
- WILLIAMS, FOSTER
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 2/26/99
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- BRICE, SANDERS, HALCRO
- DP: ROKEBERG, MURKOWSKI, HARRIS, CISSNA,
- L&C RPT 7DP
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- FINANCE REFERRAL ADDED
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor