+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/27 CHAPTER 3 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/28/13
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- 3:40 PM 3/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 67(MLV)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, STEVENS, OLSON,
- HOFFMAN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 67(MLV)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, FRENCH
- COGHILL, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, KELLY, DUNLEAVY, ELLIS,
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: DYSON, GIESSEL, STEDMAN
- STA RPT 3DP
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 67(MLV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: CSHB 67(MLV)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX, MUNOZ, GARA, FEIGE, NEUMAN, P.WILSON, PRUITT,
- REINBOLD, COSTELLO, HIGGINS, SEATON, KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: GRUENBERG, SADDLER, HIGGINS, REINBOLD, HUGHES, FOSTER, LEDOUX
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 7DP
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor