+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN2: (GOV)
- AM: KAUFMAN, VANCE
- NR: CLAMAN
- DNP: EASTMAN
- DP: STORY, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
- DNP: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3DNP
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER JUD
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21