+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (73)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/28/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 40 SLA 93
- 5:50 PM 5/27/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- TAKEN FROM PENDING FILE
- IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION
- RESCIND ACTION PSG SCS CSHB 64(FIN) AM S
- RESCIND ACTION IN ADOPTING SCS UNAN CON
- IN THIRD READING ON CSHB 64(FIN)
- (S) ADOPTED LETTER OF INTENT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, RIEGER
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES, MENARD
On May 6, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
On May 2, 1993 in the Senate:
- PLACED IN SECRETARY'S PENDING FILE
On May 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/2/93
On April 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/1/93
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- RULES 2CAL 1NR 4/29/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TAKE UP RECON SAME DAY FAILED Y9 N11
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 64(FIN)AM S
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- (ADM-2, DPS, LAW, CORR)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES TO SCS
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
On April 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE
On April 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS S ZERO FN (CORR)
- STA RECOMMEND JUD LETTER OF INTENT
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS, ADM-2)
On April 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS, ADM-2)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (CORR)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD REPORT
- JUD RPT 4DP
On March 25, 1993 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY, THEN STA, FINANCE
- STATE AFFAIRS REFERRAL ADDED
On March 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- DONLEY, LITTLE, SALO
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN, ELLIS,
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 15, 1993 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 64(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): SITTON, BROWN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 N- E2 A1
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS(DPS, LAW) 3/1/93
- -3 ZERO FNS(ADM, ADM, CORR) 3/12/93
- DP: GRUSSENDORF,NAVARRE,BROWN,THERRIAULT
- DP: MACLEAN,LARSON,HANLEY,MARTIN,PARNELL
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 9DP
On March 1, 1993 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 4DP
- -3 ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS, CORR) 3/1/93
- DP: PORTER, PHILLIPS, NORDLUND, KOTT
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD REPORT
On February 24, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND, PARNELL
On February 15, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARNEY
On February 3, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE
On February 1, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
On January 29, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PORTER
On January 15, 1993 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor