+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- MEMBERS: SHIRLEY MARQUARDT, WANETTA AYERS
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- 4:46 P.M. 7/2/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 20 SLA 21
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 63(TRA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, STEVENS, BISHOP, HOLLAND, STEDMAN, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 63(TRA)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
- DP: MYERS, KIEHL, MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 63(STA)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, JOSEPHSON, TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, WOOL, VANCE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 63(STA)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 6DP
- DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR
- DP: DRUMMOND, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, HOPKINS
- NR: MCCABE, CRONK
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor