+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 61 SLA 03
- 11:55 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 E3 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 61(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 61(RES)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- BILL NOT TAKEN UP 5/17-ON 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: OLSON, BUNDE, HOFFMAN
- DP: WILKEN, TAYLOR, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 3DP 3NR
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- NR: LINCOLN
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER;
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 61(FIN)
- PASSED Y33 N4 E2 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 61(FIN)
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- DP: MEYER, WHITAKER, FOSTER, CHENAULT,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 2NR
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, CROFT
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: MASEK, KERTTULA
- DP: GATTO, LYNN, MORGAN, WOLF, FATE;
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- KOHRING; AM: KERTTULA
- DP: FATE, ROKEBERG, MCGUIRE, CHENAULT,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) NT 5DP 1AM
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- O&G, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS