+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: (EED)
- DNP: CRONK, GILLHAM, PRAX
- DP: ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, STORY, DRUMMOND
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 4DP 3DNP
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21