+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/12
- 2:49 PM 5/25/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 56 SLA 12
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 60
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 60
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2012
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- FIN RPT 6DP
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, EGAN, MENARD, ELLIS, WAGONER, STEVENS
- FN3: ZERO(DFG)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN3: ZERO(DFG)
- DP: PASKVAN, WAGONER, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS
- RES RPT 5DP
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: HB 60
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 60
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y35 E5
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: GARDNER, P.WILSON, FEIGE
- DP: MUNOZ, FOSTER, DICK, HERRON, SEATON
- RES RPT 5DP 3NR 1AM
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- DP: AUSTERMAN, THOMPSON
- FSH RPT 2DP 3NR 1AM
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: HERRON, PRUITT, JOHNSON
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor