+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (87)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 5/13/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 64 SLA 97
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/2/97
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y30 N3 E1 A6
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N5 E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE 3RD TIME SCS CSHB 6(FIN) AM S
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PHILLIPS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- LEMAN, SHARP, MACKIE, TORGERSON, GREEN,
- PHILLIPS, MILLER
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y14 N2 E1 A3
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- FAILED TO ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG Y14 N5 E1
- THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1DNP 1NR TECH TITLE CHG
- DP: PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- DONLEY; NR: TORGERSON; DNP: ADAMS
- FNS TO SCS (DHSS-8, LAW)
- (H) ZERO FNS APPLY TO SCS (ADM, DPS)
On April 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 4DP 1NR TECH TITLE CHG
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PEARCE, PARNELL
- NR: ELLIS
- (H) FNS APPLY (DHSS-8)
- (H) ZERO FNS APPLY (ADM, LAW, DPS)
On April 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD, FINANCE
On April 18, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 6(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y29 N8 E3
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECONSIDERATION WITHDRAWN
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 17, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y17 N22 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, KEMPLEN
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: THERRIAULT, FOSTER, KELLY, DAVIS,
- KOHRING; NR: MOSES, HANLEY
- AM: GRUSSENDORF, DAVIES
- 8 FNS (DHSS) 2/21/97
- 3 ZERO FNS (ADM, LAW, DPS) 1/31/97
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: PORTER, GREEN, BUNDE
- NR: JAMES, BERKOWITZ
- AM: ROKEBERG, CROFT
- 8 FISCAL NOTES (DHSS)
- 3 ZERO FNS (ADM, DPS, LAW) 1/31/97
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, BUNDE, PORTER
- NR: BRICE, KEMPLEN; AM: VEZEY
- 8 FISCAL NOTES (DHSS)
- 3 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, ADM, LAW)
- CMTE REC FINANCE REFERRAL
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RYAN
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, JUDICIARY
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor