+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MLV CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 6(MLV)
- PASSED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, GARA, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 6(MLV)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP
- DP: LEDOUX, TILTON, HUGHES, KITO, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, LEDOUX, COLVER, HUGHES, TUCK, HERRON
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, GRUENBERG, LEDOUX, COLVER
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, L&C
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor