+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 59(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2012
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 59(FIN)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: FAIRCLOUGH
- NR: DOOGAN, NEUMAN
- DP: GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, COSTELLO, JOULE, EDGMON, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR 1AM
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- FSH REFERRAL WAIVED
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- FSH, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11