+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (57)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 142 SLA 03
- 9:46 AM 7/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 E2 A4
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 59(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUESS, DYSON,
- STEVENS G, SEEKINS, WAGONER, LINCOLN,
- FRENCH, ELLIS, ELTON, TAYLOR, STEVENS B
- COWDERY, WILKEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 59(FIN)
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN3: (DEC)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- STEVENS B, TAYLOR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, HOFFMAN, BUNDE,
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH, OGAN;
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: (DEC)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2003
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 59(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 59(FIN) AM
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: CROFT, MOSES, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, JOULE;
- AM: HAWKER
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DEC)
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: (DEC)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- MCGUIRE; NR: COGHILL
- DP: HOLM, GARA, GRUENBERG, ANDERSON,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor