+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- FN6: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP
- REFERRED TO RULES
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 2DNP
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- DNP: PRAX, KURKA
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor