+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 11:55 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 58 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N8 E3 A1
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 57(FIN)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 57(FIN)
- PASSED Y15 N4 E1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- BILL NOT TAKEN UP 5/17-ON 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- NR: TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 57(FIN)
- PASSED Y30 N6 E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 57(FIN)
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: (DNR) RECEIVED
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 5NR
- DP: WHITAKER, FOSTER, CHENAULT,
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER, HAWKER,
- STOLTZE, JOULE, CROFT
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER O&G
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 6DP
- DP: CHENAULT, CRAWFORD, ROKEBERG,
- FATE, MCGUIRE, KOHRING
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/17/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES