+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, SADDLER, MINA, PRAX
- HSS RPT 6DP
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, STAPP, TOMASZEWSKI
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, STORY, WRIGHT
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, HIMSCHOOT, STUTES
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY, CARPENTER, MINA, ALLARD
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRAX
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor