+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/29/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 86 SLA 04
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- 3:56 PM 6/24/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 559 AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 559 AM
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FIN RPT 4DP
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- NR: DAVIS, STEVENS G
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, FRENCH;
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On May 1, 2004 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- VERSION: HB 559 AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 559
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y35 N1 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2004
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FOSTER, MEYER; NR: STOLTZE
- DP: JOULE, MOSES, CHENAULT, FATE,
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor