+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2012
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 55(JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, TUCK, OLSON, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 55(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, PETERSEN
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, KELLER, THOMPSON, HOLMES, GATTO
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor