+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 89 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/04
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- 3:56 PM 6/24/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 545(L&C)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 545(L&C)
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON; NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FIN RPT 2DP 2NR
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 545(L&C)
- PASSED Y34 E1 A5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: CSHB 545(L&C)
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: GARA, SAMUELS, OGG, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DAHLSTROM, GATTO; AM: GUTTENBERG
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, ROKEBERG,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 1AM
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor