+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO CSHB & SCS PUBLISHED (DCED)
- L&C RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 22, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N2 A2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 21, 1993 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/93
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 54(L&C)
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- VEZEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 13, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED) 3/17/93
- NR: MARTIN, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: MACLEAN,LARSON,HANLEY,PARNELL,BROWN
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 5DP 2NR
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, PORTER, PHILLIPS, NORDLUND
- NR: KOTT, JAMES
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED) 3/17/93
On March 19, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On March 17, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/17/93
- DP: GREEN, HUDSON
- DP: PORTER, MACKIE, MULDER, WILLIAMS
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 6DP
On January 14, 1993 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)