+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On August 14, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 109 SLA 02
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- 2:53 PM 6/18/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 53(STA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 53(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y17 N3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 1 LEMAN WITHDREW AS SPONSOR
- AM NO 1 DONLEY ADDED AS SPONSOR
- AM NO 1 OFFERED BY LEMAN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- 5/15 CAL NOT TAKEN UP- ON 5/16 CALENDAR
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- 5/14 CAL NOT TAKEN UP- ON 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- 5/13 CAL NOT TAKEN UP- ON 5/14 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 1OR 5/13/02
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN3: (GOV)
- WARD
- DNP: DONLEY; NR: GREEN, OLSON, WILKEN,
- DP: KELLY, AUSTERMAN, LEMAN;
- FIN RPT 3DP 1DNP 4NR
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN3: (GOV)
- NR: STEVENS, WILKEN
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR;
- RES RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN FORTHCOMING
- DP: DAVIS
- NR: THERRIAULT, HALFORD, STEVENS;
- STA RPT 1DP 3NR
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
- PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 53(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/01
- VERSION: CSHB 53(STA)
On April 28, 2001 in the House:
- HUDSON, FOSTER, MULDER, WILLIAMS;
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 8DP 1NR
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, LANCASTER,
- NR: BUNDE
- FN2: (DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- FN1: (GOV)
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, CRAWFORD, JAMES,
- STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP
- FATE, HAYES, COGHILL
- FN1: (GOV)
- FN2: (DNR)
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (DNR)
- FN1: (GOV)
- CISSNA, CHENAULT
- DP: MURKOWSKI, HAYES, GREEN, KOTT,
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- MLV, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS