+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 153 SLA 04
- 10:01AM 6/30/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 522 AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 522 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- WAGONER, STEVENS B
- DP: OGAN, ELTON, DYSON,
- RES RPT 5DP
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 522 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 522 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2004
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DAHLSTROM, MASEK; NR: GATTO, WOLF
- DP: LYNN, STEPOVICH, HEINZE, KERTTULA,
- RES RPT 6DP 2NR
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor