+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- NR: PATKOTAK
- DP: CRONK, MCKAY, GILLHAM
- DNP: FIELDS, SCHRAGE, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS
- RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 3DP 5DNP 1NR
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- REFERRED TO RULES
- RAUSCHER CHANGED FROM DNP TO DP UC
- RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 4DP 4DNP 1NR (CHANGED)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRONK
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: STORY
- DP: VANCE, STUTES, ORTIZ, TARR
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 4DP 1NR
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21