+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/3/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/5 CHAPTER 41 SLA 03
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- 11:28AM 5/14/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N2 E3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 52(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2003
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, STEVENS G,
- WAGONER, SEEKINS, LINCOLN, FRENCH,
- ELTON, TAYLOR, OGAN, COWDERY, GUESS,
- BUNDE, WILKEN, OLSON, ELLIS
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 52(STA)
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: THERRIAULT, FRENCH
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN;
- JUD RPT SCS(STA) 2DP 2NR
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- NR: GUESS
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON;
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 9
- STA RPT SCS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 52(JUD)
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 V1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 52(JUD)
- PASSED Y37 E1 A1 V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, CROFT, GUTTENBERG
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, HAWKER
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/5
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2003
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- DP: COGHILL, GRUENBERG, ANDERSON,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 7DP
- MCGUIRE, SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DAHLSTROM, WEYHRAUCH; AM: BERKOWITZ
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM, LYNN,
- STA RPT 6DP 1AM
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- WEYHRAUCH
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER, STOLTZE, CISSNA,
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, CRAWFORD, HOLM
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/17/03)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor