+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- TECHNICAL CORRECTION
- 9:59 AM 6/17/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 61 SLA 02
On May 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 52 AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 52 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/02
On May 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP
- DP: TAYLOR, ELLIS, COWDERY, THERRIAULT
- FN4: (COR)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER FIN
- FN3: (S.FIN/COR)
- GREEN, AUSTERMAN, WILKEN, OLSON
- DP: DONLEY, LEMAN, WARD; NR: KELLY,
- FIN RPT 3DP 5NR
On May 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED REFERRED TO FIN
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 28, 2001 in the House:
- AM TO AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 52
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N34 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- PASSED Y35 N4 E1
- AM NO 2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y37 N1 E1 A1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 52 AM
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On April 27, 2001 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/01
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- DP: KOHRING, MORGAN, MCGUIRE, KOTT;
- RLS RPT 4DP 2NR
- NR: BERKOWITZ, JOULE
- FN2: (COR)
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On April 21, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (COR)
- FN1: (COR)
- HARRIS, HUDSON, WILLIAMS
- DP: WHITAKER, CROFT, DAVIES, LANCASTER,
- FIN RPT 7DP
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (COR)
- DNP: COGHILL, OGAN, JAMES; NR: MEYER
- DP: BERKOWITZ, KOOKESH, ROKEBERG;
- JUD RPT 3DP 3DNP 1NR
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: (COR)
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor