+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- 10:35 AM 6/12/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 102 SLA 96
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/96
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 515 AM
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DHSS)
On April 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 515 AM
- PASSED Y27 N5 E3 A5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 12, 1996 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- HES RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY, ROBINSON
- DP: BRICE
- NR: ROKEBERG
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor