+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 107 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/04
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 513(JUD)
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 513(JUD)
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DNP 3NR SAME TITLE
- NR: SEEKINS, FRENCH, THERRIAULT;
- DNP: OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 513
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 513
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: SAMUELS, GRUENBERG, OGG, ANDERSON,
- MCGUIRE; NR: GARA, HOLM
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor