+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On October 16, 2023 in the House:
- 10:45 A.M. 8/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 8/26/23
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39
- FN1: (DOT) FROM SB 67
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
- CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, TOBIN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON,
- OLSON, BISHOP, CLAMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S)
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/23
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N2
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51
- PASSED Y35 N1 E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 51
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N22 E2
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N37 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 2/24 - ON 2/27 CALENDAR
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- HELD TO 2/24 CALENDAR
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2023
- HELD TO 2/22 CALENDAR
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- L&C RPT 6DP
- DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SADDLER, PRAX, CARRICK, RUFFRIDGE
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEARS
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C