+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 123 SLA 04
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 51(HES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 51(HES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, FRENCH,
- STEVENS G, OLSON
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- WAGONER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH,
- L&C RPT 5DP
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: GUESS
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN, DAVIS;
- HES RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, L&C
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 51(HES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, BERKOWITZ
- PASSED Y34 E4 A1 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 51(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2003
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(HES) 6DP 1NR
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON; NR: ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- WILSON
- DP: HEINZE, GATTO, SEATON, CISSNA,
- HES RPT CS(HES) 5DP
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- HES, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/17/03)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor