+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO THE HOUSE
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- ADJOURNED SINE DIE
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 503
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N5
- AM 1 COSPONSORS: WILKEN, BUNDE,
- STEVENS B, SEEKINS, STEVENS G, DYSON,
- ELTON, ELLS, LINCOLN, GUESS,
- STEDMAN, COWDERY
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HB 503 AM S
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- MOTION TO CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, ELLIS,
- JUD RPT 5DP
- THERRIAULT, OGAN
On April 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- PASSED Y36 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 503
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 503
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- DP: HAWKER, FATE, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor