+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 27, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR WITHDRAWN: CARNEY
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BARNES, PHILLIPS
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: GREEN
On April 14, 1993 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/14/93
- NR: PORTER, MACKIE, GREEN, HUDSON
- DP: MULDER, SITTON, WILLIAMS
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
On February 15, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 14, 1993 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)