+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: ZULKOSKY
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- FN9: ZERO(DPS)
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 3DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN8: ZERO(COR)
- AM: EASTMAN, VANCE
- FN10: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
- FN11: (ADM)
- FN12: (ADM)
- FN13: (LAW)
- FN14: (DPS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- STA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 5AM
- DP: TARR
- AM: VANCE, STORY, EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN5: (LAW)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN6: (DPS)
- FN7: (DPS)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor