+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 16, 2015 in the House:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 5/14/15
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- 12:12 PM 4/27/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CORRECTED W/SCS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11
- DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, MICCICHE
- NR: COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/DHS)(CORRECTED)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A4
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 5(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, OLSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 5(JUD)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 5
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 5
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/DHS)(CORRECTED)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: LYNN, KELLER, LEDOUX
- NR: CLAMAN
- AM: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD